THE G W PADLEY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1001215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES,PREDOMINATELY IN LINCOLNSHIRE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £706
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 December 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID GEORGE PADLEY Trustee
None on record
STEVEN JOHN PADLEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £109 £27 £6 £128 £706
Total expenditure £0 £0 £700 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 19 February 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 09 February 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
D G PADLEY C/O G W PADLEY HOLDINGS LIMITED
EMPINGHAM ESTATE
HORN LANE
TICKENCOTE
STAMFORD
PE9 4AL
Phone:
01780460186
Website:

No information available