THE MUSEUM OF THE MERCIAN REGIMENT (WORCESTERSHIRE & SHERWOOD FORESTERS COLLECTION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To collect, preserve and display items relating to the History of the Regiment and to provide information to the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 13 December 1990: Standard registration
- THE SHERWOOD FORESTERS REGIMENTAL MUSEUM (Previous name)
- THE WORCESTERSHIRE AND SHERWOOD FORESTERS MUSEUM (THE SHERWOOD FORESTERS COLLECTION) OF THE MERCIAN REGIMENT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brig Peter Dennis CBE | Chair |
|
||||||
Mark John Shaw | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
LORD LIEUTENANT DERBYSHIRE ELIZABETH JANE FOTHERGILL CBE | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Neil Atkin | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mel Siddons | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HARRISON | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
LT COLONEL KEITH SPIERS OBE | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIR JOHN WILFRED PEACE | Trustee | 26 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Honorary Alderman BRIAN GROCOCK | Trustee | 12 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Col David Sneath MA TD DL | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRIGADIER EDWARD WILKINSON CBE TD DL | Trustee |
|
||||||
LIEUTENANT COLONEL DES FITZGERALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LIEUTENANT COLONEL MARK ANDRE HOLDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.10k | £55.45k | £52.97k | £36.03k | £45.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.75k | £39.19k | £42.92k | £35.91k | £37.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.21k | £144 | N/A | £22.31k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 06/05/1990 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/11/2012 as amended on 21 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO HOLD TOGETHER THE TRADITIONS OF THE REGIMENT AND TO PERPETUATE ITS HISTORIC DEEDS AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO APPOINT TRUSTEES TO HOLD THE REGIMENTAL COLLECTION UPON TRUST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FORESTERS HOUSE
ARMY RESERVE CENTRE
SWINEY WAY
CHILWELL
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
NG9 6QX
- Phone:
- 01159724498
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window