Financial history INTERPLAY THEATRE TRUST

Charity number: 1001229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £203.65k £240.87k £198.48k £271.68k £236.35k
Total expenditure £198.16k £173.03k £302.21k £276.71k £257.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £60.45k £26.38k £166.46k £32.72k