PORTSMOUTH CHINESE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The association organised outings and festivals during the year which were very sucessful and enjoyable for the members. The activities include celebration for fund raising for Chinese New Year Celebration, International Women day, Children & Teenages Activities, X'mas Party,Spring Festival Party and other celebration held for National Day Party etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2019
People

6 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 13 December 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHU YUAN LU | Trustee | 01 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
WAI FUN LAU | Trustee | 01 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MING HE YANG | Trustee | 01 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALBERT CHOI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHIEN CHEN YU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE HE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.62k | £73.78k | £46.72k | £53.26k | £52.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.71k | £65.88k | £34.68k | £38.80k | £43.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 335 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 335 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 701 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 701 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1066 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1066 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1431 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1431 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 15 March 2023 | 1018 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 15 March 2023 | 1018 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH AUGUST 1988
Charitable objects
[1] TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF PORTSMOUTH AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND IN PARTICULAR ITS ETHNIC CHINESE POPULATION WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION TO GIVE FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THE POOR AND NEEDY AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. [2] TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PEOPLE OF THE CITY OF PORTSMOUTH AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD CONCERNING CHINA, ITS PEOPLE, HISTORY,LANGUAGE AND LITERATURE, ITS INSTITUTIONS, FOLKLORE AND CULTURE AND ITS INTELLECTUAL, ARTISTIC AND ECONOMIC LIFE.
Area of benefit
PORTSMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
208 KINGSTON ROAD
PORTSMOUTH
PO2 7LR
- Phone:
- 02392665182
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window