THE ELDON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations for charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Durham
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 12 December 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Countess of Eldon | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Alexander Columba Scott-Tonge | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
The Earl of Eldon Jock Eldon | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.40k | £6.12k | £0 | £2.51k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.15k | £10.50k | £0 | £3.00k | £6.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 December 2024 | 319 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 February 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 February 2022 | 374 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
MAKING SUBSCRIPTIONS TO CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND BODIES AND OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE APPLICATIONS FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Pilrig St
Edinburgh
Midlothian
EH6 5AJ
- Phone:
- 0131 553 1931
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window