LOCKINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1001251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The premises is a traditional Village Hall which was formally a village school. The Village Hall is run for the benefit of all parish residents to provide a local meeting place for village organisations and individuals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £33,216
Total expenditure: £42,434

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 December 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LOCKINGTON VILLAGE HALL AND COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Iain Gaydon Chair 03 October 2017
None on record
Stephanie Taylor Trustee 29 November 2022
None on record
Louise Spence Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Heather Crosby Trustee 18 January 2018
None on record
Sue Burgess Trustee 21 March 2017
None on record
ANDREW PROCTOR Trustee
None on record
Andrew Edge Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.77k £22.99k £45.54k £23.99k £33.22k
Total expenditure £11.64k £12.33k £28.86k £26.80k £42.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.63k £21.75k £2.25k £6.80k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lockington Village Hall
Chapel Street
Lockington
DRIFFIELD
YO25 9SN
Phone:
07758785223
Website:

No information available