ST. MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a fund for children to pay in music tuition income, milk income, trip income, charity events income, school photograph income, book club income, and to pay out expenditure in accordance with user accounts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 12 December 1990: Standard registration
- ST MARYS CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL CREDENHILL (Working name)
- CREDENHILL CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris White | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Pattison | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
John TOLSON | Trustee | 21 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MERRICK | Trustee | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
MIKE WILKINSON | Trustee | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.30k | £541 | £7.76k | £32.62k | £40.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.14k | £11.88k | £6.45k | £30.43k | £49.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 24 AUGUST 1990
Charitable objects
A)TO PROVIDE SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR THE SCHOOL,NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE L.E.A. B)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN THE PARISH OF CREDENHILL.C)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WITHIN THE COUNTY OF HEREFORD AND WORCESTER.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CREDENHILL AND COUNTY OF HEREFORD AND WORCESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
STATION ROAD
CREDENHILL
HEREFORD
HR4 7DW
- Phone:
- 01432760408
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window