Trustees FOUNDATION FOR EUROPEAN ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1001277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Maria Nikolaidi Trustee 14 February 2024
None on record
Dr ALEX NUNN Trustee 01 March 2023
None on record
Dr JOHN HASKELL Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Dr OLGA MIKHEEVA Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Dr Torsten Heinrich Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
DR ANDREA BERNARDI Trustee 26 July 2018
None on record
Dr Charles Dannreuther Trustee 26 July 2018
None on record
Prof Wilfred Dolfsma Trustee 20 January 2017
None on record
Dr OLIVER EDLER VON HAYEK KESSLER Trustee 08 January 2013
None on record
Dr MARIA LISSOWSKA Trustee
None on record