NUNEATON AND BEDWORTH TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1001282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of local newspapers on audio tape for the blind & partially sighted.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,075
Total expenditure: £2,129

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 December 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Trevor Woolacott Chair 28 February 2022
None on record
Alan Graham Pendleton Trustee 15 December 2013
None on record
JOAN MARGARET SIDWELL Trustee
None on record
MRS L M HOLT Trustee
None on record
MRS S D PENDLETON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £337 £508 £0 £160 £1.08k
Total expenditure £1.30k £512 £965 £2.04k £2.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
27 Hogarth Close
Bedworth
CV12 8TL
Phone:
02476491109
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available