Trustees ARUN YOUTH AQUA CENTRE

Charity number: 1001294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jason Brockhurst Chair 24 November 2018
None on record
Esther Louise O'Toole Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Dr Denise Jane Harris Trustee 30 June 2023
None on record
Laura Brockhurst Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
ROB ELLIOTT Trustee 08 May 2012
None on record
JAMES MILLETT Trustee
None on record