HAEMOCHROMATOSIS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To SUPPORT and inform people with genetic haemochromatosis. To promote public AWARENESS of genetic haemochromatosis. To encourage and support RESEARCHinto haemochromatosis. To EDUCATE healthcare professionals and others with an interest in genetic haemochromatosis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 December 1990: Standard registration
- HAEMOCHROMATOSIS UK (Working name)
- HUK (Working name)
- THE HAEMOCHROMATOSIS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aaron Venables | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Guillaume Fillias | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Brunyee | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Vousden | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dieter Krapp | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Pippa Randolph | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £364.70k | £317.67k | £366.14k | £436.81k | £423.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £324.53k | £229.43k | £326.02k | £457.30k | £394.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 SEPTEMBER 1990, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 NOVEMBER 1990 AND 19 JUNE 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 JUL 2016 as amended on 24 Jul 2019 as amended on 28 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
1)TO PROVIDE FOR PERSONS WITH HEREDITARY HAEMOCHROMATOSIS OR ASSOCIATED DISEASES HELP WITH THOSE PROBLEMS(INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO DIAGNOSIS,MEDICAL CARE,TREATMENT & FINANCIAL BURDEN) RESULTING FROM THE DISEASES & TO PROVIDE SUCH OTHERS CHARITABLE RELIEF AS THE SOCIETY MAY THINK FIT.2.)TO UNDERTAKE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RESEARCH INTO THE DISEASES & TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 3.)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC & THE MEDICAL PROFESSION INTO THE CAUSES OF:(A) INCREASING THE PROPORTION OF HAEMOCHROMATOTICS DIAGNOSED AS SUCH (B) PROMOTING DIAGNOSIS AT AN EARLY STAGE BEFORE THE ONSET OF IRREVERSIBLE ORGAN DAMAGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Flaxmill
Flaxmill Lane
Pinchbeck
Spalding
Lincolnshire
PE11 3YP
- Phone:
- 03030401101
- Email:
- office@huk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window