Accounts and annual returns CHESTER PAROCHIAL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 1001314
Charity reporting is up to date (178 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 November 2023 05 March 2025 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 November 2023 05 March 2025 178 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 November 2022 01 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 November 2022 01 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 November 2021 28 April 2023 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 08 November 2020 15 October 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 November 2020 15 October 2021 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 November 2019 30 October 2020 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 November 2019 30 October 2020 52 days late Download Open in new window