THE MARLBOROUGH BRANDT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the link between Marlborough, Wiltshire and Gunjur, The Gambia. Through exchange, environment enhancement and education. Providing opportunities for personal, professional and community development. Broadening minds, and developing friendships and other links.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 02 January 1991: Standard registration
- MBG (Working name)
- WILTSHIRE GLOBAL EDUCATION CENTRE (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Davies | Chair | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Max Kedar Gajadharsingh | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Busby | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Johnson | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.15k | £54.00k | £23.05k | £30.85k | £9.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.58k | £79.50k | £36.08k | £30.86k | £29.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 November 2020 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/12/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/09/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE IN THE GAMBIA AND THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: • PROMOTING AND SUSTAINING THE LINK THAT HAS BEEN ESTABLISHED BETWEEN THE CHARITY AND THE PEOPLE OF GUNJUR IN THE GAMBIA,AND PROMOTING SIMILAR LINKS ELSEWHERE; • ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN GUNJUR AND ELSEWHERE IN THE GAMBIA BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT, TRAINING AND OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR EDUCATION AT SCHOOLS IN GUNJUR AND ELSEWHERE IN THE GAMBIA; AND • ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE GAMBIA IN THE SUBJECTS OF GLOBAL EDUCATION, CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, HUMAN RIGHTS, RELIGIOUS HARMONY AND HEALTH EDUCATION. (2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN THE GAMBIA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF: • EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; AND • GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. (3) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE GAMBIA. 1.2 THIS PROVISION MAY BE AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION BUT ONLY WITH THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION.
Area of benefit
MARLBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Matthews Walk
CIRENCESTER
Gloucestershire
GL7 1HL
- Phone:
- 01285878819
- Email:
- info@mbg.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window