GLASCOTE MEETING ROOM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide accomodation for community clubs such as Brownies, Rainbow guides, Mother and toddler clubs, Karate classes, Childing Minding club, Knit and Natter group, School holiday group as well as one off party dates for local residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 03 January 1991: Standard registration
- JOINT USERS COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Jenkins | Chair | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Galsworthy | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Alfred Dawes | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jean Dawes | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.93k | £812 | £11.58k | £8.00k | £11.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.68k | £22.99k | £7.24k | £7.63k | £8.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GLASCOTE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD. B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION.
Area of benefit
GLASCOTE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Sunbeam
TAMWORTH
Staffordshire
B77 2RR
- Phone:
- 07929430438
- Email:
- gmrtamworth@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window