Financial history JEWISH LADIES' AID SOCIETY

Charity number: 1001412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.24k £24.97k £21.88k £10.63k £17.68k
Total expenditure £12.90k £24.50k £15.43k £15.58k £19.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A