RODBOROUGH PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NURSERY EDUCATION OF CHILDREN FROM 30 MONTHS TO SCHOOL AGE. PLAYGROUP RUN BY A VOLUNTARY PARENT'S COMMITTEE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £70,347 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 07 January 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan McDowell | Chair | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Curry | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Harrison | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Jemma Lewis | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Stephens | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Miladowska | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Freya Beard | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Forrester | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ishen Paran | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kate Burley | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Verity Jane Pearce | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janine Swindell | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.56k | £73.83k | £106.90k | £111.07k | £107.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.79k | £81.61k | £103.09k | £109.44k | £114.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £61.63k | £61.77k | £76.61k | £84.89k | £70.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD MAY 1990. PATA MODEL ADOPTED 20 JANUARY 2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE GROUP IS TO EMBODY THE VISION OF PATA THROUGH THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE DEVELOPMENT, CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE AND ALSO OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY (VOLUNTARY MANAGED) GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREA
Area of benefit
RODBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rodborough Playgroup
Tabernacle Walk
Rodborough
STROUD
Gloucestershire
GL5 3UJ
- Phone:
- 01453 756141
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window