YORK FILM TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education of the public in film and the moving image as an art form and as a medium for information, education and social enlightenment with particular reference to the County of Yorkshire and the City of York. Promoting the study of films.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of York
Governance
- 09 January 1991: Standard registration
- 10 March 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- YORK FILM THEATRE LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £718 | £1.02k | £814 | £603 | £17.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.42k | £4.57k | £2.41k | £7.04k | £17.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 14 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 07 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 22 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 23 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 24 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 15 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MARCH 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 APRIL 1990, AS AMENDED 20TH OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE FILM AS AN ART AND AS A MEDIUM FOR INFORMATION EDUCATION AND SOCIAL ENLIGHTENMENT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE COUNTY OF YORK AND CITY OF YORK AND TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF FILMS
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF YORK AND THE CITY OF YORK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window