Accounts and annual returns HABERDASHERS' ASKE'S FEDERATION TRUST
Charity number: 1001489
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 23 March 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 23 March 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 05 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 02 February 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 19 May 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 27 April 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 11 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 16 January 2008 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window