Governing document HABERDASHERS' ASKE'S FEDERATION TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH AUGUST 1990, AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS PASSED 19TH DECEMBER 1990, 6TH MARCH 2006, 5TH MARCH 2007,3 MARCH 2009 AND 6 JANUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING,CARRYING ON AND DEVELOPING ONE OR MORE SECONDARY SCHOOLS OR COLLEGES OFFERING A BROAD CURRICULUM, INCLUDING THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WITH A STRONG EMPHASIS IN PARTICULAR AREAS OF THE CURRICULUM TO BE DETERMINED BY THE BOARD OF GOVERNORS IN CONSULTATION WITH THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR EDUCATION IN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.