Financial history ST MICHAEL'S PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1001490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £16.54k £18.82k £24.86k £26.58k £20.75k
Total expenditure £32.06k £26.10k £17.08k £19.64k £33.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £500 N/A N/A N/A