Financial history DOMINICA NATIONAL DEVELOPMENT AND DISASTER FUND

Charity number: 1001492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.59k £154 £402 £2.86k £1.68k
Total expenditure £3.72k £633 £583 £4.06k £1.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A