Accounts and annual returns THE TONY BRAMALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1001522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 21 May 2024 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 21 May 2024 106 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 18 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window