FORD HOUSE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ford House Trust was established to provide charitable relief of sickness, starvation, malnutrition, poverty and suffering, the advancement of education and the promotion of the Christian religion, by way of donating to selected causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 January 1991: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SEAN CONVEY | Chair | 15 March 1991 |
|
|
||||
MARIA THERESE AITCHISON | Trustee | 01 April 2006 |
|
|
||||
CIARAN FRANCIS CONVEY | Trustee | 01 April 2006 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC ANTHONY CONVEY | Trustee | 04 November 2000 |
|
|
||||
DAMIEN PATRICK CONVEY | Trustee | 15 March 1991 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE JANE VOGIARIDIS | Trustee | 15 March 1991 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MAVIS CONVEY | Trustee | 15 March 1991 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.47k | £0 | £590 | £1.15k | £2.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.66k | £7.60k | £7.02k | £8.11k | £6.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 DECEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
1.RELIEF OF SICKNESS, STARVATION, MALNUTRITION, POVERTY AND SUFFERING. 2.ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION .3.ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
FORD LODGE
CASTLE ROAD
KENILWORTH
CV8 1NG
- Phone:
- 01926513012
- Email:
- seanconvey@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window