Accounts and annual returns THE WELLING ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1001621
Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 March 2023 410 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 March 2023 775 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days