THE LESLIE AND RENEE WOOLF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To pay or apply capital and income of the trust to such charities, for such charitable purposes as trustees may decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
Governance
- 30 January 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ALEXANDER WOOLF | Chair |
|
|
|||||
IRESENE WOOLF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA ADLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.74k | £418 | £3.40k | £356 | £1.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.32k | £1.87k | £4.38k | £1.43k | £3.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 27TH DECEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE ANNUAL INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND WITH POWER TO PAY OR APPLY ANY PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND TO OR FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF SUCH BODIES ASSOCIATIONS OR ORGANISATIONS AS SHALL AT THE DATE OF PAYMENT OR APPLICATION BE ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES OR TO PAY OR APPLY THE SAME FOR SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS SHALL BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT UPON SUCH CONDITIONS (IF ANY) AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL RESPECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
164 BURY OLD ROAD
SALFORD
M7 4QY
- Phone:
- 01925634372
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window