WOW (WORLD OF WORTH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
World of Worth is passionate about restoring dignity, hope and worth to women and girls. WOW supports women who have been marginalised, widowed & abandoned and provides opportunities for them to transform their world through education, training & micro businesses. Our aim is to help women become self-sustainable. WOW works in Uganda, Ethiopia, Mozambique, India, Philippines & Bulgaria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bulgaria
- Ethiopia
- India
- Mozambique
- Philippines
- Uganda
Governance
- 30 January 1991: Standard registration
- KIDZADE KIDS (Working name)
- SEFTON VILLAGE (Working name)
- WCM (Working name)
- WOMEN OF WORTH (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF SEFTON VILLAGE (Previous name)
- KIDZADE KIDZ (Previous name)
- WORLD CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen John Thomas | Chair | 21 August 2014 |
|
|||||
Alistair Whitmoor-Pryer | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Catherine Marion Young | Trustee | 21 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
TONY BROWN | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.39k | £273.04k | £325.25k | £223.50k | £257.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £273.06k | £239.84k | £248.98k | £269.67k | £246.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.62k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH NOVEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION PASSED 16 JUNE 2010 UNDER SECTION 74D OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AS AMENDED BY CHARITIES ACT 2006 AS AMENDED ON 06 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN THE THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES
Area of benefit
THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 BELFIELD CLOSE
MARLDON
PAIGNTON
TQ3 1NZ
- Phone:
- 01803663681
- Email:
- Office@wowuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window