VILLAGE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Charity is to maintain the Village Hall for the communal benefits of the inhabitants of the village and its surrounds. The Charity aims to provide first class hall facilities at an affordable cost to voluntary organisations serving the community. The Charity has two self-employed part time workers, and depends upon the continuing help of local volunteers and committee members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,938 from 3 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
39 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 01 February 1991: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Wenhaston Village Hall (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susanne Cooke | Chair | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carey Taylor | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bob Rixon | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara McLaughlin | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fran Desborough | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Pitkeathly | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Corsan | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Wilkinson | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Peters | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Canham | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Hayes | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Hudson-Jary | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.40k | £30.59k | £38.48k | £23.46k | £36.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.59k | £24.80k | £27.89k | £19.11k | £37.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.94k | £27.22k | £2.67k | £8.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16TH. FEBRUARY 1951
Charitable objects
A CLUB OR RECREATION OR MEETING ROOM FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL & MENTAL TRAINING & RECREATION & SOCIAL,MORAL & INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING & RECREATION ROOMS,LIBRARY,LECTURES,CLASSES,RECREATIONS & ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WENHASTON & ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
WENHASTON & IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Post Office
Wenhaston Village Hall
Hall Road
Wenhaston
HALESWORTH
Suffolk
- Phone:
- 07563066482
- Email:
- wenhastonhall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window