EMH CARE AND SUPPORT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of persons with learning difficulties, sensory or other diasbilities (including but not limited to persons who are physcially, mentally/learning disabled, mentally ill, chronically sick, vulnerable or in necessitous circumstances) by provision of accomodation, and other amenities, facilities and services calcualted to alleviate the disabilities and suffering of such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£20,957,100
Donations and legacies | £250.00k | |
Charitable activities | £19.79m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £254.96k | |
Other | £658.89k |
Total expenditure:
£20,918,671
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £20.82m | |
Other | £99.00k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £15,520,405 from 11 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £99.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £20.82m | |
Retained for future use | £38.43k |
People

373 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 29 January 1991: Standard registration
- ECHS LIMITED (Working name)
- ENABLE CARE & HOME SUPPORT LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Chapman | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Timothy John Michael Bishop | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Richard Lawton | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ketteridge | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET COWARD | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Patricia McCabe | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.23m | £18.71m | £18.53m | £18.25m | £20.96m | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.39m | £17.09m | £19.08m | £19.62m | £20.92m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.00m | £6.42m | £6.40m | £12.13m | £15.52m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £151.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £250.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £17.09m | £17.92m | £19.96m | £18.04m | £19.79m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £17.00k | £2.62k | £404 | £2.48k | £254.96k | |
|
Income - Other | £122.00k | £788.22k | £577.13k | £209.31k | £658.89k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £16.36m | £17.05m | £19.03m | £19.57m | £20.82m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £31.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £37.00k | £37.14k | £46.31k | £51.18k | £99.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.99m | £9.74m | £9.46m | £8.79m | £8.45m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £8.37m | £9.41m | £9.26m | £8.53m | £8.82m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£344.00k | -£785.00k | -£667.00k | -£659.00k | -£652.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.03m | £2.31m | £2.54m | £2.63m | £2.72m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/04/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/12/1990 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 SEP 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, OR SENSORY OR OTHER DISABILITIES (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PERSONS WHO ARE PHYSICALLY, MENTALLY OR LEARNING DISABLED OR MENTALLY ILL OR CHRONICALLY SICK OR VULNERABLE OR IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES FOR SOME OTHER REASON) BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, AND OTHER AMENITIES, FACILITIES AND SERVICES (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF CARE, WELFARE AND NURSING SERVICES) CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THE DISABILITIES AND SUFFERING OF SUCH PERSONS; (B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE PROVISION OF HOUSING AND CARE FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, MOBILITY PROBLEMS OR OTHER DISABILITIES (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PERSONS WHO ARE PHYSICALLY, MENTALLY OR LEARNING DISABLED OR MENTALLY ILL OR CHRONICALLY SICK OR VULNERABLE OR IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES FOR SOME OTHER REASON) OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE EXPERIENCING POOR HOUSING CONDITIONS; (C) TO UNDERTAKE OR FACILITATE RESEARCH IN CONNECTION WITH THE PRECEDING OBJECTS UPON TERMS THAT SUCH RESEARCH SHALL BE PUBLISHED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
East Midlands Housing Group
Memorial House
Whitwick Business Park
Stenson Road
COALVILLE
LE67 4JP
- Phone:
- 01530276000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window