Financial history CLIVE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1001707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/03/2020 01/03/2021 01/03/2022 01/03/2023 01/03/2024
Total gross income £19.46k £5.27k £39.23k £61.55k £55.39k
Total expenditure £27.06k £4.88k £31.48k £53.44k £134.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £12.76k £15.00k N/A