HOSPICE CARE KENYA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support for the provision of palliative care in Kenya. This is done by supporting the training of health professionals, purchase of vehicles, purchase of drugs and start up costs for new hospice ventures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
Governance
- 12 March 1991: Standard registration
- 15 September 2011: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 15 September 2011: Funds transferred to 1141469 HOSPICE CARE KENYA LIMITED
- THE NAIROBI HOSPICE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE NAIROBI HOSPICE TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.87k | £84.21k | £63.30k | £52.37k | £91.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.70k | £107.16k | £56.35k | £62.48k | £107.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 25 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 25 August 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 13 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 13 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 05 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 05 June 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 20 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 20 June 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29TH JANUARY 1991
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH PUBLIC CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF KENYA DIRECTED TOWARDS THE TREATMENT CARE AND COUNSELLING OF PERSONS WHO ARE TERMINALLY ILL WITH CANCER OR OTHER INCURABLE DISEASES AND THE COUNSELLING OF THEIR FAMILIES AND CLOSE ASSOCIATES AND TOWARDS THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR SUCH TREATMENT CARE AND COUNSELLING AND TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND EXTENSION OF THE SAID NAIROBI HOSPICE AT NAIROBI AND AT OTHER PLACES IN KENYA AS AFORESAID AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
KENYA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window