Financial history THE VIOLET MAURAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1001716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £57.69k £50.64k £53.80k £57.46k £61.52k
Total expenditure £107.57k £51.26k £103.74k £97.07k £97.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A