Governing document Colchester Toy Library

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH APRIL 1990 AS AMENDED ON 6TH NOVEMBER 1990 AND 23RD SEPTEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED ON 19 OCT 2004 AS AMENDED ON 30 JUN 2005 AS AMENDED ON 09 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 MAY 2019 as amended on 09 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND EDUCATE CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR THOSE WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS, BY THE PROVISION OF PLAY EQUIPMENT AND INSTRUCTION. TO PROMOTE THE SHARING, RESUSE AND RECYCLING OF TOYS FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION
Area of benefit
COLCHESTER & DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.