Accounts and annual returns FAMILY LIFE AND MARRIAGE EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1001753
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 07 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 21 January 2008 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 21 January 2008 82 days late
Annual return 31 December 2005 27 November 2006 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required