FREE SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintains the Free School and Institute for use by the church and community; makes grants for the maintenance of St.George's Brailes and the services therein; makes grants to Brailes C.E.Primary School; makes educational grants to young persons under the age of 25 and resident in the parish of Brailes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 31 January 1991: Standard registration
- BRAILES FREE SCHOOL FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brett Hay | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Gerald Cole | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev George Heighton | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Mr Tim Rimell | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Joanne Haycock | Trustee | 05 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
GLENDA WOODS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.30k | £41.99k | £46.43k | £47.73k | £51.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.66k | £38.57k | £5.05k | £37.17k | £53.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18 JULY 1990
Charitable objects
1 MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF BRAILES AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES THEREIN 2 IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER 25 YRS WHO ARE RESIDENT OR WHO HAVE A PARENT RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF BRAILES AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT 3 IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING FOR PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE SAID PARISH 4 IN TOWARDS PROVIDING FOR BRAILES CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE SAID SCHOOL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BRAILES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burnt Orchard
Upper Brailes
BANBURY
OX15 5AT
- Phone:
- 01608664151
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window