SAVE CHARLTON ASSEMBLY ROOMS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We saved and restored a building from demolition in the 1970s. We handed the building back to the London Borough of Greenwich in 1983. Our legal Agreement with Royal Greenwich Council ended December 2017. We now work together with Royal Greenwich Heritage to oversee the upkeep and use of this now Grade 11 listed building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Greenwich
Governance
- 11 February 1991: Standard registration
- SCARP (Working name)
- SAVE CHARLTON ASSEMBLY ROOMS PRIOJECT (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GWENDOLINE C ZAMMIT BEM | Chair | 01 April 1983 |
|
|
||||
David Whitehead | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Purtill | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ceri McDonald | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
KITTY BADEN-POWELL | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS GWEN ZAMMIT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £750 | £160 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST. DECEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO MANAGE THE ASSEMBLY ROOM BUILDING KEEPING IT IN GOOD REPAIR & DECORATION WITH THE INTENTION OF MAKING IT AVAILABLE FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH & IN PARTICULAR FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARLTON HOUSE COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 BEGBIE ROAD
LONDON
SE3 8BY
- Phone:
- 02088567373
- Email:
- gwenzammit@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window