1ST HARROW WEALD & 4TH KENTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As Scouts, we believe in preparing young people with skills for life. We encourage our young people to do more, learn more and be more. Each week, the 1st Harrow Weald Scout Group give young people of Harrow the opportunity to enjoy fun and adventure while developing the skills they need to succeed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Harrow
Governance
- 11 February 1991: Standard registration
- 12 February 2025: Funds received from 305781 4TH KENTON (ST MARYS) SCOUTS GROUP
- 1ST HARROW WEALD SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauk Tozer | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Thomas Jospeh Devine | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ranjan Mepani | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arpna Gopal | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.80k | £20.58k | £17.76k | £7.89k | £10.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.31k | £18.53k | £6.88k | £17.74k | £15.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.47k | £11.63k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF 4TH. JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTIONS OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES, IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 WOODHALL LANE
WATFORD
WD19 6HD
- Phone:
- 02084281123
- Email:
- 1hwScouts@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window