GLOUCESTERSHIRE CLOUD 9 CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cloud 9 charity has progressed to become a Wish granting organisation fundraising to provide funded holidays within Europe for seriously ill, life limiting children between the ages of 0 and 18 years residing in gloucestershire. Children who suffer from severe ill health & life threatening illness. Funding can be made available for the child & immediate family subject to medical referral.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 05 February 1991: Standard registration
- 03 December 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 03 December 2021: Funds transferred to 1011611 THE PIED PIPER TRUST
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE CLOUD 9 CHARITY (Working name)
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE CLOUD 9 FUND (Previous name)
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE CLOUD NINE FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.04k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.46k | £4.07k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 19 August 2020 | 293 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 30 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02/01/1991 AS AMENDED ON 06/08/1999 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM LIFE THREATENING DISEASES OR THOSE WITH SEVERE PHYSICAL DISABILITY BY THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS OR EXCURSIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE, GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window