Financial history LONDON DRAMA

Charity number: 1001819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.02k £7.78k £10.77k £7.85k £7.30k
Total expenditure £13.05k £8.24k £9.26k £7.85k £7.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A