Financial history LONDON BLACK WOMEN'S PROJECT

Charity number: 1001834
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £474.99k £1.41m £1.44m £1.58m £1.61m
Total expenditure £464.48k £1.20m £1.29m £1.50m £1.72m
Income from government contracts N/A £219.93k £235.43k £233.00k £233.00k
Income from government grants £108.96k £236.17k £162.21k £162.18k £473.15k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £354.00k £348.70k £177.62k £192.48k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £1.05m £1.09m £1.40m £1.42m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £83 £49 £2.02k £5.29k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.20m £1.29m £1.49m £1.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £345 £54 £1.73k £2.26k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £6.94k £0 £0 £16.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0