LONDON BLACK WOMEN'S PROJECT

Charity number: 1001834
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

LONDON BLACK WOMEN'S PROJECT (LBWP) PROVIDES THE FOLLOWING SERVICES UNDER A FRAMEWORK TO END VIOLENCE AGAINST WOMEN AND GIRLS: EMERGENCY ACCOMMODATION AND HOUSING SUPPORT SERVICES, COUNSELLING, SERVICE FOR YOUNG WOMEN AND GIRLS INCLUDING SUPPORT GROUPS, AND LEGAL ADVICE AND INFORMATION.IN ADDITION LBWP PROVIDES CAPACITY BUILDING TRAINING TO PROFESSIONALS, RESEARCH AND POLICY DEVELOPMENT.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 February 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • NEWHAM ASIAN WOMEN'S PROJECT (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Donna Marie Elizabeth Carty Trustee 20 January 2021
None on record
Edem Barbara Ntumy Trustee 07 January 2021
None on record
Chardine Taylor-Stone Trustee 07 January 2021
None on record
RENA PATHAK Trustee 15 March 2011
None on record
ANJUM MOUJ Trustee 01 December 2001
IMAAN LGBTQI+ MUSLIM SUPPORT
Received: 95 days late
SURRIYA AHMAD Trustee
None on record
SAIKA ALAM Trustee
None on record
PALVINDER KUDHAIL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £474.99k £1.41m £1.44m £1.58m £1.61m
Total expenditure £464.48k £1.20m £1.29m £1.50m £1.72m
Income from government contracts N/A £219.93k £235.43k £233.00k £233.00k
Income from government grants £108.96k £236.17k £162.21k £162.18k £473.15k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £354.00k £348.70k £177.62k £192.48k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £1.05m £1.09m £1.40m £1.42m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £83 £49 £2.02k £5.29k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.20m £1.29m £1.49m £1.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £345 £54 £1.73k £2.26k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £6.94k £0 £0 £16.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A £383 £5.69k £3.91k £4.23k
Long-term investments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets N/A £484.55k £633.54k £678.92k £607.07k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £230.14k £233.15k £189.63k £229.81k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 March 2025 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 March 2025 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 March 2024 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 March 2024 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 December 2023 322 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 December 2023 322 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Resource Centre
661 Barking Road
LONDON
E13 9EX
Phone:
02084720528