BOLTON YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main activities :youth and community work, play and children's work, health sports and fitness, Youth Cafe, detached youth work. personal and social development for people who are disadvantaged by poverty, disability, health issues, young offenders, members of minority community groups enabling them to develop and make a positive contribution to the community in which they live.,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Bury
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Wigan
Governance
- 12 February 1991: Standard registration
- BOLTON YMCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Blackburn YMCA | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.55k | £339.71k | £227.12k | £219.05k | £239.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.22k | £997.55k | £292.23k | £256.21k | £245.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.00k | N/A | £28.11k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JANUARY 1991 as amended on 05 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE IN BOLTON. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS OF THE PUBLIC IN BOLTON. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROMOTION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN BOLTON. 4.THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE. 5. PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PERSONS IN BOLTON.
Area of benefit
BOLTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ymca
125 Deansgate
BOLTON
BL1 1HA
- Phone:
- 01204 522855
- Email:
- melissa.lloyd@yhousing.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window