Financial history STOKE-ON-TERN PARISH HALL

Charity Number: 1001912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.27k £6.04k £13.01k £1.41k £5.93k
Total expenditure £7.69k £2.23k £5.37k £8.45k £7.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £11.43k N/A N/A