Trustees STOKE-ON-TERN PARISH HALL

Charity number: 1001912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Scott Neville Trustee 11 June 2023
None on record
Jennifer Marsh Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
Jane Gittins Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Andrew Higginson Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Dave Cintas Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
MRS A SMITH Trustee 29 March 2012
None on record
DAVID MOORE Trustee
None on record
ERIC CLIFF MOORE EC Trustee
None on record