Financial history KIRBY MISPERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1001931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £15.81k £55.51k £33.61k £15.17k £11.08k
Total expenditure £29.43k £24.07k £34.76k £33.84k £8.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £200
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £19.78k N/A N/A