Accounts and annual returns CROYDON Y M C A HOUSING ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1001942
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 11 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 10 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 13 February 2007 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 19 February 2007 19 days late
Annual return 30 June 2005 27 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 27 April 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 28 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 28 January 2005 On Time