THE EDEN CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Works in partnership with local churches and supports them in all areas of youth work - Encourages an understanding of the Christian faith among young people - Provides activities and opportunities that will bring young people together and encourage 'community' - Works with un-churched young people on the streets and in the community generally
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,400 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 19 February 1991: Standard registration
- ECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy William Hill | Chair | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Marshall | Trustee | 06 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sue White | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA STAPLETON | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY SUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIGITTE GHYSELBRECHT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.16k | £49.77k | £34.73k | £33.81k | £55.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.40k | £32.32k | £34.53k | £46.07k | £44.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.49k | £6.33k | £13.75k | £9.60k | £1.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1991
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS SET OUT IN THE TRUST DEED. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Paulinus Church Centre
Hillcrest Road
EDENBRIDGE
Kent
TN8 6JS
- Phone:
- 07738 232296
- Email:
- ect.youthworker@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window