VIETNAMESE MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established to preserve and protect the good mental health of person from Vietnam and their dependants resident in the UK. Services provided include: outreach; support to users/carers; day centre; Counselling; education/information and training to Vietnamese people about mental health issues, health/social care system; publishing booklets & Health Newsletter in Vietnamese, Chinese & English.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £93,574 from 2 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 February 1991: Standard registration
- VIETNAMESE MENTAL HEALTH PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Lili Ly | Chair | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tan Tuoc Luong | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIU HAN LAU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HONG THI NGUYEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TAM MY THI NGUYEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.20k | £231.52k | £227.70k | £208.05k | £99.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.85k | £211.60k | £187.11k | £212.19k | £235.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £193.63k | £131.28k | £128.78k | £116.18k | £93.57k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.35k | £7.06k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH. JANUARY 1991 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED AT AGM OF 20 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE & PROTECT THE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS FROM VIETNAM & THEIR DEPENDANTS RESIDENT IN LONDON.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 FAIR STREET
LONDON
SE1 2XF
- Phone:
- 02072340601
- Email:
- info@vmhs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window