FAMILIES FIRST (NORTH EAST)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE RELIEF AND EDUCATION OF LOCAL CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC, EDUCATIONAL AND STIMULATING TOYS AND EQUIPMENT. WE ALSO DELIVER HEALTH PROMOTION ADVICE, EDUCATION PARENTS REGARDING THE VALUE OF PLAY AND POSITIVE PARENTING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income:
£632,634
Donations and legacies | £12.61k | |
Charitable activities | £576.04k | |
Other trading activities | £41.21k | |
Investments | £28 | |
Other | £2.75k |
Total expenditure:
£575,304
Raising funds | £16.29k | |
Charitable activities | £559.02k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £108,610 from 3 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £16.29k | |
Charitable expenditure | £559.02k | |
Retained for future use | £57.33k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 25 February 1991: Standard registration
- 25 November 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 25 November 2019: Funds transferred to 1183964 FAMILIES FIRST (NORTH EAST)
- DURHAM FAMILIES FIRST (Working name)
- HARTLEPOOL FAMILIES FIRST (Working name)
- STOCKTON FAMILIES FIRST (Working name)
- HARTLEPOOL FAMILIES FIRST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £448.84k | £395.99k | £474.93k | £628.75k | £632.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £459.52k | £449.92k | £449.25k | £582.64k | £575.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £153.00k | £161.30k | £86.30k | £108.61k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £16.25k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £93.64k | £12.61k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £239.95k | £41.21k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £295.13k | £576.04k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £28 | £28 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £2.75k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £407.55k | £559.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £173.66k | £16.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.44k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £59.48k | £100.83k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £60.02k | £87.55k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £31.86k | £25.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 26 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 26 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/12/1989 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2001 AS AMENDED ON 28/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 28 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
1)THE RELIEF AND EDUCATION OF ALL CHILDREN, PARTICULARLY THOSE WITH ADDITIONAL AND SPECIAL NEEDS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL, PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT ACTIVITIES AND THERAPEUTIC, EDUCATIONAL AND STIMULATING TOYS AND EQUIPMENT. 2)THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH WITHIN ALL RESIDENTS, INCLUDING THE PROMOTION OF A POSITIVE AND HEALTHY LIFESTYLE. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF VOCATIONAL EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF ALL AGES THROUGHOUT THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND. 4) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED, WHICH SUPPORT AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH, EDUCATION AND PROSPERITY OF RESIDENTS OF ALL AGES THROUGHOUT THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window