Trustees THE SHEFFIELD MEDIA AND EXHIBITION CENTRE LIMITED
Charity number: 1002020

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andy Paul Heap | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brent Woods | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Anne Sheridan | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adam Thomas Lumb | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Hilton | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Rose Gilbert | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Ruth Frances Mersereau | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Sarah Bellfield | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hylda Yvonne Taylor-Smith | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hamilton-Tweedale | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dean GORMLEY | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
COLIN MICHAEL PONS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.