Financial history BURGESS AUTISTIC TRUST

Charity number: 1002032
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.82m £1.66m £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.92m £1.80m £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £1.03m £1.66m N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £10.00k £19.69k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.79m £1.56m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £16.44k £82.81k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.92m £1.80m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £39.38k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A